Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henry Joseph O’Brien

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Hartford, Connecticut, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1896Born
8 Jul 192326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
19 Mar 194043.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
19 Mar 194043.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
14 May 194043.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sita
7 Apr 194548.7AppointedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
6 Aug 195357.0AppointedArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
20 Nov 196872.3ResignedArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
20 Nov 196872.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Uthina
5 Jan 197174.4ResignedTitular Archbishop of Uthina
23 Jul 197680.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Joseph O’Brien (VIAF: 26611355)
Archbishop Henry Joseph O’Brien (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hartford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Haven

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1940, Number 29
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 668, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast