Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vito Roberti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caserta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1911Born
23 Dec 193322.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Oct 196251.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Constantia in Scythia
13 Oct 196251.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Congo, Democratic Republic of
13 Oct 196251.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Rwanda
2 Dec 196251.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Constantia in Scythia
11 Feb 196351.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi
16 Feb 196351.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
6 Jun 196452.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
15 Aug 196553.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Caserta, Italy
6 Jun 198775.7RetiredBishop of Caserta, Italy
1 Aug 199886.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vito Roberti
Archbishop Vito Roberti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caserta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatera

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast