Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedito Roberto, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Malanje, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1946Born
18 Oct 198134.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
15 Dec 199549.1AppointedBishop of Novo Redondo, Angola
25 Feb 199649.3Ordained BishopBishop of Novo Redondo, Angola
19 May 201265.5AppointedArchbishop of Malanje, Angola
8 Nov 202074.0DiedArchbishop of Malanje, Angola

MicroData Summary for Benedito Roberto
Archbishop Benedito Roberto C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop of Malanje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMussende Gango
Ordained BishopImaculada Conceição da Virgem Maria, Cathedral, Novo Redondo, Diocese of Novo Redondo
Death PlaceRegional, Hospital, Malanje, Archdiocese of Malanje

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,737
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 710
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 May 2012
  • d: CB, 9 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast