Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gino Reali

Bishop Emeritus of Porto-Santa Rufina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1948 Born
31 Jul 197123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Spoleto-Norcia, Italy
23 Feb 200254.0AppointedBishop of Porto-Santa Rufina, Italy
7 Apr 200254.1Ordained BishopBishop of Porto-Santa Rufina, Italy
5 May 202173.2ResignedBishop of Porto-Santa Rufina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gino Reali (VIAF: 4039159478212427990008)
Bishop Gino Reali (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Porto-Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonteleone di Spoleto
Ordained BishopMaria Santissima Assunta, Cathedral, Spoleto, Archdiocese of Spoleto-Norcia

Please contact the Bishop through the Suburbicarian See of Porto-Santa Rufina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,170
  • r: Bollettino, 5 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 May 2021

Quantcast