Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Marrucci

Bishop Emeritus of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1945 Born
29 Jun 197025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Volterra, Italy
25 Nov 201065.6AppointedBishop of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia, Italy
29 Jan 201165.8Ordained BishopBishop of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia, Italy
19 Feb 201165.9InstalledBishop of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia, Italy
18 Jun 202075.2RetiredBishop of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Marrucci
Bishop Luigi Marrucci (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontescudaio, Diocese of Volterra
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 2,011, Number 7
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2020
  • bpd: AM, 1 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast