Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rayarala Vijay Kumar, P.I.M.E.

Bishop of Srikakulam, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1969 Born
25 Aug 199727.8Solemn VowsMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
29 Aug 199828.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
16 Jul 201949.7AppointedBishop of Srikakulam, India
2 Sep 201949.8Ordained BishopBishop of Srikakulam, India

MicroData Summary for Rayarala Vijay Kumar
Bishop Rayarala Vijay Kumar P.I.M.E. (born ) Bishop of Srikakulam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKhammam, Diocese of Warangal
Ordained PriestCathedral, Khammam, Diocese of Khammam
Ordained BishopCathedral, Srikakulam, Diocese of Srikakulam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Srikakulam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2019
  • nm: CB, 16 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 Aug 2019
  • loc: AM, 29 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast