Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thumma Bala

Archbishop Emeritus of Hyderabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1944 Born
21 Dec 197026.6Ordained PriestPriest of Warangal, India
17 Nov 198642.5AppointedBishop of Warangal, India
12 Mar 198742.8Ordained BishopBishop of Warangal, India
12 Mar 201166.8AppointedArchbishop of Hyderabad, India
5 May 201167.0InstalledArchbishop of Hyderabad, India
19 Nov 202076.5RetiredArchbishop of Hyderabad, India

MicroData Summary for Thumma Bala
Archbishop Thumma Bala (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hyderabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNarimetta
Ordained BishopN.D. de Fatima, Cathedral, Warangal, Diocese of Warangal

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hyderabad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2011
  • i: CB, 16 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,903
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 19 Nov 2020

Quantcast