Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Randazzo

Bishop of Broken Bay, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1966 Born
29 Nov 199125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
24 Jun 201649.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
24 Jun 201649.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Quiza
24 Aug 201649.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Quiza
7 Oct 201953.0AppointedBishop of Broken Bay, Australia
4 Nov 201953.0InstalledBishop of Broken Bay, Australia

MicroData Summary for Anthony Randazzo
Bishop Anthony Randazzo (born ) Bishop of Broken Bay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSydney
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Broken Bay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Jun 2016
  • c34: CB, 24 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,082
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2019
  • i: AM, 20 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast