Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blasius Pujoraharja

Bishop Emeritus of Ketapang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1935 Born
8 Sep 196126.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 197943.7AppointedBishop of Ketapang, Indonesia
17 Jun 197944.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ketapang, Indonesia
25 Jun 201277.0RetiredBishop of Ketapang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Blasius Pujoraharja
Bishop Blasius Pujoraharja (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ketapang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGamping
Ordained BishopS. Gemma, Cathedral, Ketapang, Diocese of Ketapang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ketapang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast