Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christo Proykov

Bishop of Saint John XXIII of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1946 Born
23 May 197125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria
18 Dec 199347.7AppointedCoadjutor Apostolic Exarch of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria
18 Dec 199347.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Briula
6 Jan 199447.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Briula
5 Sep 199549.4SucceededApostolic Exarch of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria
11 Oct 201973.5AppointedBishop of Saint John XXIII of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Christo Proykov
Bishop Christo Proykov (born ) Bishop of Saint John XXIII of Sofia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSofia, Apostolic Exarchate of Sofia (Bulgarian)
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint John XXIII of Sofia (Bulgarian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,193
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 17 Jan 2021

Quantcast