Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Strahil Veselinov Kavalenov

Bishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1966 Born
18 Apr 200943.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
15 Sep 202054.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
20 Jan 202154.8AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
19 Mar 202154.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Strahil Veselinov Kavalenov
Bishop Strahil Veselinov Kavalenov (born ) Bishop of Nicopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRazgrad, Montana, Diocese of Nicopoli
Ordained PriestBl. Eugene Bossilkov Chapel, Nativity of the Mother of God, Church, Belene
Ordained BishopSan Paolo della Croce, Cathedral, Ruse, Diocese of Nicopoli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nicopoli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2020
  • b/c1: CB, 15 Sep 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2021
  • ob: AM, 10 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Mar 2021

Quantcast