Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ernesto Maria Piovella, Obl. Rho †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1867Born
11 Jun 189224.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 190739.4AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
12 May 190739.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
15 Apr 191446.4AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
8 Mar 192052.3AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
29 Aug 192052.8InstalledArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
18 Feb 194981.3DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Maria Piovella
Archbishop Ernesto Maria Piovella Obl. Rho (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 46, and Page 63
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 102
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 599, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast