Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Miglior

Deceased

Bishop of Ogliastra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1875Born
15 Jul 192751.8AppointedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
18 Sep 192752.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
6 May 193660.7DiedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Miglior
Bishop Giuseppe Miglior (born , died ) Bishop of Ogliastra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1927, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast