Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Jover Piamonte

Deceased

Archbishop of Jaro, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1934Born
22 Mar 195823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Jaro, Philippines
28 Dec 197440.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jaro, Philippines
28 Dec 197440.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gubaliana
2 Feb 197540.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gubaliana
2 Apr 198651.3AppointedArchbishop of Jaro, Philippines
17 Dec 199864.0DiedArchbishop of Jaro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Alberto Jover Piamonte
Archbishop Alberto Jover Piamonte (born , died ) Archbishop of Jaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIloilo City
Ordained BishopSte Elisabeth, Jaro, Archdiocese of Jaro

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,858

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast