Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raul José Quimpo Martirez

Bishop Emeritus of San Jose de Antique, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1938 Born
18 Mar 196123.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jan 198344.9AppointedBishop of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
24 Mar 198345.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
16 Mar 200264.1ResignedBishop of San Jose de Antique, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Raul José Quimpo Martirez
Bishop Raul José Quimpo Martirez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Jose de Antique

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Washington
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Roxas City

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Jose de Antique.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,980

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast