Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Pénzes

Bishop Emeritus of Subotica, Serbia


from the Official Web Site of the Diocese

from the Official Web Site of the Diocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1943 Born
29 Jun 196824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Subotica, Serbia
25 Apr 198945.7AppointedBishop of Subotica, Serbia
18 Jun 198945.8Ordained BishopBishop of Subotica, Serbia
8 Sep 202077.0RetiredBishop of Subotica, Serbia

MicroData Summary for János Pénzes
Bishop János Pénzes (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Subotica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBajmok
Ordained BishopSte Therčse, Cathedral, Subotica, Diocese of Subotica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Subotica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,350
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast