Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Pei Junmin

Bishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Liaoning)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1969 Born
31 May 199223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
12 Jan 200636.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
7 May 200637.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
29 Jun 200839.4SucceededBishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China

MicroData Summary for Paul Pei Junmin
Bishop Paul Pei Junmin (born ) Bishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiaoning, Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]
Ordained BishopShenyang, Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 21 Jan 2021

Quantcast