Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Giuseppe Passerini, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Achantus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1866Born
4 Oct 188620.7ProfessedMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
22 Dec 188822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
29 Mar 189529.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}, China
29 Mar 189529.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Achantus
8 Sep 189529.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Achantus
16 Apr 191852.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Pio Giuseppe Passerini (VIAF: 89308695)
Bishop Pio Giuseppe Passerini P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZinasco Vecchio, Diocese of Vigevano, Italy
Ordained BishopTong-Yuan-fang
Death PlaceHanchung

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 71
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 34
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 53
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast