Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marián Andrej Pacák, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1973 Born
16 Aug 199118.3EnteredMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
16 Aug 199724.3Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Oct 199724.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Jul 199825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
5 Jul 201845.1AppointedBishop of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada
2 Sep 201845.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada
15 Sep 201845.3InstalledBishop of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada
20 Oct 202047.4ResignedBishop of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Marián Andrej Pacák
Bishop Marián Andrej Pacák C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLevoča, Eparchy of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovakian), Slovakia
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Basilica, Michalovce, Slovakia

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2018
  • sole/c1: CB, 5 Jul 2018
  • od/c0: CB, 7 Jul 2018
  • ob: CB, 11 Jul 2018
  • c2+: CB, 15 Aug 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,846
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast