Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Siméon Oualli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1928Born
25 Feb 195729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
29 Jun 197042.3AppointedBishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
7 Oct 197042.6Ordained BishopBishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
2 Jul 198456.3ResignedBishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
17 Mar 200274.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Siméon Oualli
Bishop Siméon Oualli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-François, Diocese of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre
Ordained PriestLa Croix-Valmer, France
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de la Guadeloupe, Cathedral, Basse-Terre, Diocese of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 553

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast