Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Mesmin Lucien Cabo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1932Born
4 Oct 196431.8Ordained PriestPriest of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
2 Jul 198350.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
2 Jul 198350.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bocconia
6 Nov 198350.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bocconia
2 Jul 198451.5AppointedBishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
15 May 200875.4RetiredBishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
28 Nov 201986.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Ernest Mesmin Lucien Cabo
Bishop Ernest Mesmin Lucien Cabo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Rose
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Church, Pointe-à-Pitre, Diocese of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe
Death PlaceBasse-Terre, Diocese of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 May 2008
  • d: CB, 29 Nov 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,756

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast