Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Olaortúa Laspra, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru

Titular Bishop of Abbir Maius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1962Born
2 Oct 198219.8ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
4 Oct 198724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
2 Feb 201148.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru
2 Feb 201148.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Abbir Maius
16 Apr 201148.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abbir Maius
22 May 201148.5InstalledVicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru
8 Aug 201148.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of San José del Amazonas, Peru
1 Feb 201552.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of San José del Amazonas, Peru
1 Nov 201956.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru

MicroData Summary for Miguel Olaortúa Laspra
Bishop Miguel Olaortúa Laspra O.S.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Iquitos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilbao, Diocese of Bilbao, Spain
Ordained BishopSan José de la Montaña, Church, Bilbao, Diocese of Bilbao, Spain
Death PlaceIquitos, Vicariate Apostolic of Iquitos

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Mar 2011
  • i: CB, 15 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,037
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Aug 2011
  • rem c5+: CB, 16 Jul 2014
  • rem c5+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • r: CB, 12 Dec 2014
  • d: CB, 1 Nov 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast