Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kisumu

Archidioecesis Kisumuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Maurice Muhatia Makumba, Archbishop
  • Zacchaeus Okoth, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 21 May 1990
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Kenya
  • Square Kilometers: 4,616 (1,782 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 1728, 40100 Kisumu, Kenya
  • Telephone: 717.507.727; 738.151.685

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kavirondo
15 July 1925ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore} Prefecture Apostolic of Kavirondo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kisumu
27 May 1932ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kavirondo Vicariate Apostolic of Kisumu
Diocese of Kisumu
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kisumu Diocese of Kisumu
29 June 1953Territory LostDiocese of Kisumu (Turkana, West Suk, Uasin Gishu, Trans Nzoia, Nakuru, Baringo, Elgeyo, and Mara Kwet, except Nandi) Prefecture Apostolic of Eldoret (erected)
20 October 1959Territory LostDiocese of Kisumu (Narok)
Archdiocese of Nairobi (Kajiado)
Prefecture Apostolic of Ngong (erected)
21 May 1960Territory LostDiocese of Kisumu (South Nyanza) Diocese of Kisii (erected)
5 May 1966Territory LostDiocese of Kisumu (North Borabu and West Borabu) Diocese of Kisii
11 January 1968Territory LostDiocese of Eldoret
Diocese of Kisumu
Archdiocese of Nairobi
Diocese of Nakuru (erected) (Districts of Nakuru and Kericho)
20 January 1976Territory LostDiocese of Kisumu (Nandi (except Tindinyo Compound)) Diocese of Eldoret
27 February 1978Territory LostDiocese of Kisumu (Western Province and Tindinyo) Diocese of Kakamega (erected)
Archdiocese of Kisumu
21 May 1990ElevatedDiocese of Kisumu Archdiocese of Kisumu

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kisumu
1950227,6952,300,0009.9%690962,37111833ap1951
Diocese of Kisumu
1970454,9602,230,33020.4%105651702,6768329541ap1971
1980207,4301,028,05320.2%826346,1003411317ap1981
Archdiocese of Kisumu
1990308,0001,168,00026.4%2322456,8445412923ap1991
1999360,0001,700,00021.2%3415497,3463016625ap2000
2000369,8251,700,00021.8%3411458,2182714325ap2001
2001368,5771,713,00021.5%4110517,2272016525ap2002
2002339,6911,700,00020.0%4110516,6602117725ap2003
2003350,5961,523,25323.0%4510556,3742514827ap2004
2004371,6311,871,63119.9%4110517,2862616530ap2005
2006431,1202,061,62820.9%4412567,6983018533ap2007
2013728,8492,490,00029.3%5824828,8885227837ap2014
20161,498,0372,684,97455.8%733110414,4045927542ap2017
20191,586,2322,878,70455.1%72269816,1865626856ap2020
20211,936,4003,443,16156.2%763511117,4456126260ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Kisumu
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 24, Page 366, and Page 367
  • Diocese of Kisumu
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 45, Page 705, to Page 710
  • Archdiocese of Kisumu
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 82, Page 937

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 11 Nov 2023