Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregory O’Kelly, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Port Pirie, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1941 Born
9 Dec 197231.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Jul 200664.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Adelaide, Australia
6 Jul 200664.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ath Truim
14 Sep 200665.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ath Truim
15 Apr 200967.6AppointedBishop of Port Pirie, Australia
3 Jun 201876.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Adelaide, Australia
25 May 202078.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Adelaide, Australia
1 Aug 202078.9RetiredBishop of Port Pirie, Australia

MicroData Summary for Gregory O’Kelly (VIAF: 304790632)
Bishop Gregory O’Kelly S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Port Pirie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdelaide, Archdiocese of Adelaide
Ordained BishopAdelaide Convention Centre, Adelaide, Archdiocese of Adelaide

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port Pirie.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,244
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast