Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Victor Emmanuel Gauci

Bishop of Darwin, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1952 Born
10 Dec 197725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Adelaide, Australia
27 Jun 201866.2AppointedBishop of Darwin, Australia
26 Sep 201866.4Ordained BishopBishop of Darwin, Australia

MicroData Summary for Charles Victor Emmanuel Gauci
Bishop Charles Victor Emmanuel Gauci (born ) Bishop of Darwin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFloriana, Archdiocese of Malta
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Darwin, Diocese of Darwin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Darwin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2018
  • bp: JPG, 3 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,856

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast