Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sergio Cardinal Obeso Rivera

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México

Cardinal-Priest of San Leone I


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1931Born
31 Oct 195423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
30 Apr 197139.4AppointedBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
21 Jun 197139.6Ordained BishopBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
15 Jan 197442.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México
15 Jan 197442.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Uppenna
28 Feb 197442.3InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México
12 Mar 197947.3SucceededArchbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México
10 Apr 200775.4RetiredArchbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México
28 Jun 201886.6Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201886.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Leone I
1 Jul 201886.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Leone I
11 Aug 201987.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Sergio Obeso Rivera (VIAF: 26309554)
Sergio Cardinal Obeso Rivera (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Jalapa (Xalapa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJalapa, Diocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Auncion, Cathedral, Papantla, Diocese of Papantla, Puebla
Death PlaceCoatepec
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Jalapa, Archdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
  • a cardinal for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2007
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018
  • i: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2018
  • d: CB, 12 Aug 2019
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Aug 2021

Quantcast