Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis María Altamirano y Bulnes

Deceased

Archbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1887Born
22 Mar 191325.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 192335.9AppointedBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
19 Mar 192436.5Ordained BishopBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
13 Mar 193345.5AppointedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
4 Jun 193345.7InstalledBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
1 May 193749.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
1 May 193749.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bizya
12 Dec 194154.2SucceededArchbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
7 Feb 197082.4DiedArchbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Luis María Altamirano y Bulnes
Archbishop Luis María Altamirano y Bulnes (born , died ) Archbishop of Morelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Andrés Chalchicomula

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1924, Number 14
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 540, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast