Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Porfirio Patiño Leal

Bishop Emeritus of Córdoba, Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1949 Born
28 May 197727.5Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
15 Apr 200050.3AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Veracruz, México
14 Jun 200050.5Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba, Veracruz, México
4 Jul 202070.6ResignedBishop of Córdoba, Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Porfirio Patiño Leal
Bishop Eduardo Porfirio Patiño Leal (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonterrey
Ordained BishopCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba, Veracruz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Córdoba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,785
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast