Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Krzysztof Józef Nykiel

Regent of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1965 Born
9 Jun 199025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Łódź, Poland
26 Jun 201247.3AppointedRegent of the Apostolic Penitentiary

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Józef Nykiel (VIAF: 250332516)
Father Krzysztof Józef Nykiel (born ) Regent of Apostolic Penitentiary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsjaków

Please contact the Father through the Apostolic Penitentiary.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022