Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Virgilio Cardinal Noč

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Fabric of St. Peter

Cardinal-Priest of Regina Apostolorum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1922Born
1 Oct 194422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pavia, Italy
9 Jan 197047.7AppointedMaster of Pontifical Liturgical Celebrations of the Office of Liturgical Celebrations of the Supreme Pontiff
30 Jan 198259.8AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for Sacraments and Divine Worship
30 Jan 198259.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Voncaria
8 Feb 198259.8ResignedMaster of Pontifical Liturgical Celebrations of the Office of Liturgical Celebrations of the Supreme Pontiff
6 Mar 198259.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Voncaria
24 May 198967.1AppointedPresident of the Roman Curia - Other
28 Jun 199169.2Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199169.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana
1 Jul 199169.2AppointedPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
1 Jul 199169.2AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
26 Feb 200279.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Regina Apostolorum
24 Apr 200280.0RetiredPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
24 Apr 200280.0RetiredArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
24 Jul 201189.3DiedPresident Emeritus of the Fabric of St. Peter

MicroData Summary for Virgilio Noč (VIAF: 167550)
Virgilio Cardinal Noč (born , died ) President Emeritus of Fabric of St. Peter

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZelata di Bereguardo
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
  • a cardinal for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 24 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,786

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast