Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roberto Carboni, O.F.M. Conv.

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy

Apostolic Administrator of Ales-Terralba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1958 Born
30 Sep 197718.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
27 Jun 198223.7Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
9 Apr 198324.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
29 Sep 198425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
10 Feb 201657.3AppointedBishop of Ales-Terralba, Italy
17 Apr 201657.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ales-Terralba, Italy
4 May 201960.5AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
4 May 201960.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ales-Terralba, Italy
7 Jul 201960.7InstalledArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Carboni (VIAF: 310703625)
Archbishop Roberto Carboni O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Archbishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScano di Montiferro, Diocese of Bosa
Ordained DeaconCollegio Teologico Seraphicum, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained PriestSan Francesco d'Assisi, Church, Oristano, Archdiocese of Oristano
Ordained BishopPiazza Monsignor Tedde, Ales, Diocese of Ales-Terralba

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Oristano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2016
  • c1/ob: CB, 10 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,896
  • od/c0: AM, 14 Jan 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 May 2019
  • aadm: AM, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast