Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Fransiskus Nipa

Coadjutor Archbishop-Elect of Makassar, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1964 Born
3 Jul 199026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ujung Pandang, Indonesia
21 Oct 202359.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Makassar, Indonesia
22 Dec 202359.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Makassar, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Fransiskus Nipa
Father Fransiskus Nipa (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop-Elect of Makassar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMareali, Archdiocese of Makassar
Ordained BishopMakassar, Archdiocese of Makassar

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Makassar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2023
  • ob/c2: CB, 28 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 30 Oct 2023