Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ernest Ngboko Ngombe, C.I.C.M.

Archbishop of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1964 Born
17 Oct 198723.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
20 Jun 199632.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
11 Feb 201550.7AppointedBishop of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Apr 201550.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Nov 201955.4AppointedArchbishop of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Nov 201955.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Jan 202055.6InstalledArchbishop of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 May 202157.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Ernest Ngboko Ngombe
Archbishop Ernest Ngboko Ngombe C.I.C.M. (born ) Archbishop of Mbandaka-Bikoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKanya Mbonda
Ordained BishopSaint Hermčs, Cathedral, Lisala, Diocese of Lisala

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2015
  • c1: CB, 18 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Feb 2015
  • c2+: CB, 24 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,479
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2019
  • ab: CB, 25 Nov 2019
  • i: CB, 1 Jan 2020
  • i: CB, 1 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 May 2021

Quantcast