Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}

Dioecesis Hafniae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Czeslaw Kozon, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 29 April 1953
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Denmark
  • Square Kilometers: 2,210,324 (853,737 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.katolsk.dk/
  • Mailing Address: Katolsk Bispekontor, Gammel Kongevej 15, DK-1610 KÝbenhavn V, Danmark
  • Telephone: 33.55.60.80
  • Fax: 33.55.60.86

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Denmark
7 August 1868ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions Prefecture Apostolic of Denmark (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Denmark
15 March 1892ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Denmark Vicariate Apostolic of Denmark
12 June 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Denmark Prefecture Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda} (erected)
Diocese of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}
29 April 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Denmark Diocese of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Denmark
195023,0004,045,000.6%36771132037775338ap1951
Diocese of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}
196925,8974,842,597.5%359813319410868240ap1971
198026,4505,189,000.5%38741122367850054ap1981
199029,4095,238,913.6%36639929726735552ap1991
199634,8185,374,365.6%46539935135924952ap2001
200134,3695,451,087.6%41519237345423851ap2002
200235,0485,471,210.6%42478939315123151ap2003
200334,6555,487,752.6%38428043344822650ap2004
200435,7455,501,312.6%39387746454322250ap2005
200636,6345,516,597.7%40428244654820550ap2007
201338,6145,707,749.7%40327253643514947ap2014
201644,4285,699,220.8%3928676639339845ap2017
201949,4425,911,756.8%43307367710358740ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast