Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Navarro Castellanos

Bishop Emeritus of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1945 Born
23 Dec 197732.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
31 Jan 200459.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Acapulco, Guerrero, México
31 Jan 200459.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caput Cilla
23 Mar 200459.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caput Cilla
12 Feb 200964.0AppointedBishop of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México
27 Feb 202176.0RetiredBishop of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Navarro Castellanos
Bishop Juan Navarro Castellanos (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tuxpan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan José de Gracia
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Cristo Rey, Church, Acapulco, Archdiocese of Acapulco, Guerrero

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tuxpan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,550
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Feb 2021

Quantcast