Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Nasalli Rocca di Corneliano

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1872Born
8 Jun 189522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
25 Jan 190734.4AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
10 Feb 190734.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
6 Dec 191644.2AppointedSecret Almoner of the Office of Papal Charities
7 Dec 191644.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
21 Nov 192149.2AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
23 May 192350.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 192350.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
13 Mar 195279.5DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Nasalli Rocca di Corneliano (VIAF: 89604173)
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Nasalli Rocca di Corneliano (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiecenza

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.0 years
  • a cardinal for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 89
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 6
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,010, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast