Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Danio Bolognini

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1901Born
20 Mar 192624.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jun 194644.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
18 Jun 194644.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
29 Jun 194644.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
25 Nov 195251.0AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
2 Dec 197271.0DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Danio Bolognini
Bishop Danio Bolognini (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmola di San Giovanni in Persiceto

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast