Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Vance Murry, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1948Born
9 Jun 197930.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
24 Jan 199546.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Jan 199546.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Fuerteventura
20 Mar 199546.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fuerteventura
5 May 199849.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
29 Jun 199950.5SucceededBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
30 Jan 200758.0AppointedBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
28 Mar 200758.2InstalledBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
5 Jun 202071.4DiedBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for George Vance Murry
Bishop George Vance Murry S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Youngstown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamden, NJ
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Death PlaceMemorial Sloan Kettering, Hospital, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,498
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 5 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast