Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Müller, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Trondheim, Norway


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1951Born
1971²19.5EnteredMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
18 Mar 197826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
9 Feb 198836.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Trondheim, Norway
20 Jun 199746.0AppointedPrelate of Trondheim, Norway
28 Jul 199746.1Ordained BishopPrelate of Trondheim, Norway
8 Jun 200958.0ResignedPrelate of Trondheim, Norway
25 Oct 201564.3DiedPrelate Emeritus of Trondheim, Norway

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg Müller
Bishop Georg Müller SS.CC. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Trondheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVolkesfeld, Mayen-Koblenz, Diocese of Trier, Germany
Ordained PriestCongregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary, College, Simpelveld, Limburg, Diocese of Roermond, Netherlands
Ordained BishopSaint Olav, Church, Trondheim, Territorial Prelature of Trondheim
Death PlaceCongregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary, Münster, North Rhine-Westphalia, Diocese of Münster, Germany
Buried Place (Original)St Christophorus, Church, Werne, North Rhine-Westphalia, Diocese of Münster, Germany

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,034
  • d: CB, 27 Oct 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • aadm: CB, 18 Sep 2019
  • loc: CL, 6 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast