Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Monaghan

Deceased

Bishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles

Apostolic Administrator of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1812¹Born
30 Apr 185038.3AppointedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
16 Feb 185139.1Ordained BishopBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
185240.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
14 Jul 185543.5DiedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Monaghan
Bishop Michael Monaghan (born 1812, died ) Bishop of Roseau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArdagh, Diocese of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Port of Spain, Archdiocese of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago
Death PlaceSaint Thomas

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 485
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 8
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,367
  • c34/d: CB, 16 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast