Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrico Masseroni

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vercelli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1939Born
29 Jun 196324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Novara, Italy
3 Oct 198748.6AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
8 Dec 198748.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
13 Dec 198748.8InstalledBishop of Mondovi, Italy
10 Feb 199656.9AppointedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
24 Mar 199657.0InstalledArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
27 Feb 201475.0RetiredArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
30 Sep 201980.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Masseroni (VIAF: 66573169)
Archbishop Enrico Masseroni (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorgomanero, Diocese of Novara
Ordained PriestCathedral, Novara, Diocese of Novara
Ordained BishopCathedral, Novara, Diocese of Novara
Death PlaceCasa di cura Monsignor Luigi Novarese, Moncrivello, Archdiocese of Vercelli
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Sant’Eusebio, Cathedral, Vercelli, Archdiocese of Vercelli

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,517
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2014
  • c1/i/loc: AM, 4 Sep 2018
  • d: CB, 30 Sep 2019
  • loc: AM, 20 Oct 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 15 Jan 2021

Quantcast