Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aldo Del Monte

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1915Born
29 Jun 193924.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Dec 197055.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Acqui, Italy
29 Dec 197055.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti
31 Jan 197155.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti
15 Jan 197256.6AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
9 Apr 197256.8InstalledBishop of Novara, Italy
19 Dec 199075.5RetiredBishop of Novara, Italy
16 Feb 200589.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aldo Del Monte (VIAF: 88863380)
Bishop Aldo Del Monte (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontù Beccaria
Ordained BishopDomus Mariae, via Aurelia, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 670

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast