Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placido Maria Cambiaghi, B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1900Born
15 Mar 192423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
15 Nov 195353.1AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
20 Dec 195353.2Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
28 Feb 196362.4AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
30 Oct 197171.1ResignedBishop of Novara, Italy
18 Dec 198787.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Placido Maria Cambiaghi
Bishop Placido Maria Cambiaghi B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonza
Ordained BishopSan Carlo ai Catinari, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 682, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 711
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 850, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast