Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Capiz

Archidioecesis Capicensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 17 January 1976
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 2,633 (1,016 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the civil province of Capiz and the City of Roxas
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, P.O. Box 44, 5800 Roxas City, Capiz, Philippines
  • Telephone: (036)621-5595; 621-1053

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Capiz
27 January 1951ErectedDiocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta (Capiz and RomblÚn) Diocese of Capiz (erected)
29 June 1951Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Capiz (from Cebu)
19 December 1974Territory LostDiocese of Capiz (Romblon)
Vicariate Apostolic of Calapan (Maestre de Campo island)
Diocese of Romblon (erected)
17 January 1976Territory LostDiocese of Capiz (Aklan) Diocese of Kalibo (erected)
Archdiocese of Capiz
17 January 1976ElevatedDiocese of Capiz Archdiocese of Capiz

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Capiz
1958549,528619,53288.7%72727,6322950ap1960
1970721,690803,72689.8%1001007,2163252ap1971
Archdiocese of Capiz
1980503,000537,00093.7%454511,1774322ap1981
1990619,873637,68297.2%63639,8397124ap1991
1999622,437648,37296.0%73738,5268530ap2000
2000638,339669,94795.3%76768,39910230ap2001
2001640,240674,15695.0%84847,62111830ap2002
2002646,853680,89795.0%89897,26812330ap2003
2003655,353694,48994.4%87877,53213226ap2004
2004665,317705,48994.3%90907,39214226ap2005
2006682,360722,79294.4%96967,10713226ap2007
2013741,002794,35993.3%10521076,92527426ap2014
2016777,999835,45793.1%972997,858410935ap2017
2019810,386865,72593.6%11431176,926298537ap2020
2021820,900904,68990.7%11361196,898358737ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Capiz
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 43, Page 264, to Page 266
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 44, Page 163, to Page 167
  • Archdiocese of Capiz
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 165, and Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024