Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Marín de San Martín, O.S.A.

Under Secretary of the Synod of Bishops

Titular Bishop of Suliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1961 Born
5 Sep 198221.0First VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
1 Nov 198524.1Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
4 Jun 198826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
6 Feb 202159.4AppointedUnder Secretary of the Synod of Bishops
6 Feb 202159.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Suliana
11 Apr 202159.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suliana

MicroData Summary for Luis Marín de San Martín
Bishop Luis Marín de San Martín O.S.A. (born ) Under Secretary of Synod of Bishops

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Madrid, Spain
Ordained BishopSanta María la Real de la Almudena, Cathedral, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Synod of Bishops.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 Mar 2021
  • c2: CB, 9 Apr 2021
  • c3: CB, 10 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast