Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Malaspina

Auxiliary Bishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Pupiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1967 Born
13 Dec 199124.4Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Mar 201850.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Mar 201850.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pupiana
1 May 201850.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pupiana

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Malaspina (VIAF: 95150323724509972116)
Bishop Eduardo Malaspina (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Carlos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTabatinga, Diocese of São Carlos, Sao Paulo
Ordained BishopSão Carlos Borromeu, Cathedral, São Carlos, Diocese of São Carlos, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Carlos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Mar 2018
  • c34: CB, 18 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,774

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast