Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ruy Serra

Deceased

Bishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1900Born
9 Dec 192323.7Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos do Pinhal, Brazil
13 Feb 194847.8AppointedBishop of São Carlos do Pinhal, Brazil
1 May 194848.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Carlos do Pinhal, Brazil
19 Sep 198686.4DiedBishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ruy Serra
Bishop Ruy Serra (born , died ) Bishop of São Carlos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampinas

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast