Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Magee, S.P.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Cloyne, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1936 Born
17 Sep 195821.9ProfessedMember of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
17 Mar 196225.4Ordained PriestPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
8 Feb 198245.3AppointedMaster of Pontifical Liturgical Celebrations of the Office of Liturgical Celebrations of the Supreme Pontiff
17 Feb 198750.3AppointedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
17 Mar 198750.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
24 Mar 201073.5ResignedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Magee
Bishop John Magee S.P.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cloyne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewry
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cloyne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Mar 2010
  • c1: CB, 6 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast