Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luiz Fernando Lisboa, C.P.

Bishop of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1955 Born
23 Jan 197721.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
18 Dec 198226.9Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Passion
10 Dec 198327.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
12 Jun 201357.4AppointedBishop of Pemba, Mozambique
24 Aug 201357.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pemba, Mozambique
14 Sep 201357.7InstalledBishop of Pemba, Mozambique
11 Feb 202165.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil
20 Mar 202165.2InstalledBishop of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Fernando Lisboa
Archbishop Luiz Fernando Lisboa C.P. (born ) Bishop of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarques de Valença, Diocese of Valença, Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopSanto Antônio, Cathedral, Osasco, Diocese of Osasco, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2013
  • ob/i: CB, 22 Jun 2013
  • c2+: CB, 9 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,853
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2021
  • i: CB, 17 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Feb 2021

Quantcast