Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Evangelista de Lima Vidal

Deceased

Bishop of Aveiro, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1874Born
19 Dec 189622.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 190934.9SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo
29 Apr 190935.0ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo
29 Jun 190935.2Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo
9 Dec 191541.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
9 Dec 191541.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
23 May 192349.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Vila Real, Portugal
31 May 193359.1ResignedBishop of Vila Real, Portugal
31 May 193359.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus
16 Jan 194065.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Aveiro, Portugal
5 Jan 195883.7DiedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João Evangelista de Lima Vidal (VIAF: 17276959)
Archbishop João Evangelista de Lima Vidal (born , died ) Bishop of Aveiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAveiro

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 48.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,115
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 56
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Apr 2021

Quantcast